Tnb chairman
Webb8 maj 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR, May 8 — Datuk Seri Mahdzir Khalid is the new chairman of Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB). He officially clocks in on May 12. The position was previously held by Tan Sri Ahmad Badri Mohd Zahir, who was appointed the Employee Provident Fund (EPF) chairman beginning May 1, 2024. Mahdzir was the deputy minister … Webb27 aug. 2024 · Mahdzir, 60, served as chairman of TNB since May 12, 2024, when he took over from Tan Sri Ahmad Badri Mohd Zahir, who was appointed Employee Provident …
Tnb chairman
Did you know?
Webb30 sep. 2024 · Rompin MP Hasan Arifin named as TNB chairman Fourth chairman in under 20 months as new man replaces Mahdzir Khalid, who resigned last month after his appointment as rural development minister.... Webb27 mars 2024 · Abdul Razak resigns as Petronas Gas director following appointment as TNB chairman KUALA LUMPUR (March 27): Datuk Abdul Razak Abdul Majid has resigned from Petronas Gas Bhd’s board as an independent non-executive director, effective from Monday (March 27). He joined the group as a director in September 2024.
Webb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR (Sept 30): Rompin Member of Parliament (MP) Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin has been appointed the new chairman of national utility company Tenaga …
Webb1 okt. 2024 · Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin as its chairman effective today to replace Datuk Seri Mahdzir Khalid who was appointed as the Rural Development Minister with effect from Aug 30, 2024. Hasan is a current member of parliament for Rompin and was appointed as chairman of Pengurusan Aset Air Bhd last … WebbJames McAndrews is an economist specializing in money and banking. He is the CEO and Chairman of the Board of TNB USA Inc., a Connecticut …
Webb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR, Sept 30 — Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed former Public Accounts Committee (PAC) chairman, Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin, as its …
Webb30 sep. 2024 · In a filing with Bursa Malaysia on Thursday, TNB said Hasan, former Pahang deputy menteri besar (1995-1999), is also currently the chairman of Pengurusan Aset Air Bhd. Notably, he was also the chairman of the Public Accounts Committee (PAC) from 2015 to 2024, and was on the board of directors of UDA Holdings Bhd from 2010 to 2015. parental leave government australiaWebb23 mars 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR (March 23): Datuk Abdul Razak Abdul Majid, who has served Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) for 36 years, has been appointed as the group’s new non-independent non-executive chairman for a … parental leave from workWebbHe is a former chairman of the board for Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB) from 12 April 2004 to 11 March 2024, making him the longest-serving chairman of the company. He also served as the chairman of the boards for Universiti Tenaga Nasional (UNITEN) and its pro-chancellor. He also serves as a director of Kapar Energy Ventures Sdn Bhd from 2004. parental leave government of canada employeesWebb30 sep. 2024 · PETALING JAYA: Tenaga Nasional Berhad (TNB) has appointed Hasan Arifin as its chairman, with the Rompin MP stepping into his new role tomorrow. He will … parental leave new york stateWebb30 dec. 2024 · TNB said Hasan, 69, shall also relinquish his chairmanships and directorships in the respective subsidiaries within TNB group of companies. PETALING … times internet limited zaubaWebb30 sep. 2024 · KUALA LUMPUR, Sept 30 — Tenaga Nasional Bhd (TNB) has appointed former Public Accounts Committee (PAC) chairman, Datuk Seri Hasan Arifin, as its chairman effective October 1, 2024, succeeding Datuk Seri Mahdzir Khalid who was appointed Minister of Rural Development with effect from August 30, 2024. times internet limited wikiWebb• Chairman of the Board and Board member in several organisations. M&A, DD, fund raising. • 10 years of P&L responsibility of revenues of 2-6 Billion SEK • 10 years of … parental leave in spanish